Accounts and annual returns VICTIM SUPPORT HARINGEY
Charity number: 291260
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | 03 November 2008 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | 29 September 2008 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 03 November 2008 | 277 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 03 January 2008 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 08 January 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 16 January 2007 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 14 February 2006 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 14 February 2006 | 14 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 12 October 2004 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 12 October 2004 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window