Trustees DOVER CASTLE LODGE NO 7202 CHARITIES TRUST FUND
Charity number: 291449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Gareth Swallow | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Leroy Marsh | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK WHIBLEY | Trustee | 30 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Ellis | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
EDWIN MARTIN ADKINS | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MCDOUGALL BOAG | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.