THE CAMROSE COMMUNITY TOY LIBRARY

Charity number: 291600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £11.21k £8.36k £4.85k £6.44k £6.30k
Total expenditure £5.33k £4.53k £6.84k £6.85k £8.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A