Financial history THE ASSOCIATED BOARD OF THE ROYAL SCHOOLS OF MUSIC

Charity number: 292182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £49.78m £54.58m £57.00m £23.40m £42.50m
Total expenditure £48.11m £53.57m £49.59m £31.35m £35.19m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.00k £323.00k £17.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £24.00k £28.00k £8.00k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £7.41m £8.25m £8.24m £7.61m £6.83m
Income - Charitable activities £42.08m £45.88m £48.29m £15.39m £35.58m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £8.00k £0 £0
Income - Investment £123.00k £161.00k £210.00k £66.00k £53.00k
Income - Other £139.00k £263.00k £266.00k £328.00k £41.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £47.47m £52.99m £43.00m £25.06m £29.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £239.00k £215.00k £231.00k £179.00k £113.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £7.07m £7.19m £377.00k £244.00k £201.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £642.00k £576.00k £6.59m £6.30m £6.00m