Trustees THE HEALTHCARE PLAY SPECIALIST EDUCATION TRUST
Charity number: 292218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINA CLEGG | Chair | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA VOOS | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY SUTHERLAND | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
RHONDA ALEXANDER | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lee Pryor | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYNN ANN RANDALL | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
AIMEE COLTMAN | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE GARDNER | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOY CLAPHAM | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Laila Paulsen-Becejac | Trustee | 11 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JAMES SPICER | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|||||
IRENE O'DONNELL | Trustee | 06 March 2012 |
|
|||||
EMMA LOUISE EARDLEY | Trustee | 03 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ANN DIBBLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS ALISON TONKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMA JEAN JUN-TAI | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANET MORRIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
FRANCES BARBOUR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.