Trustees HOUSE MILL TRUST LTD
Charity number: 292336
Charity reporting is overdue by 141 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN HAGGERTY | Chair | 05 July 1995 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WALTERS | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Harbold | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Spalding | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Feeroza Patel | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CREGAN | Trustee | 04 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY A CHARTERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.