Financial history THE BARNS GREEN MONDAY CLUB

Charity number: 292617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.37k £8.32k £3.58k £7.34k £1.10k
Total expenditure £6.97k £7.48k £3.79k £6.66k £465
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A