Financial history THE UNITARIAN SOCIETY FOR PSYCHICAL STUDIES

Charity number: 292651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.40k £1.26k £1.76k £1.50k £774
Total expenditure £1.43k £955 £878 £1.42k £111
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A