Governing document LAKSHMI-NARAYANA TRUST
Charity number: 292677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23/08/1985 AS AMENDED ON 27/12/1993 AS AMENDED ON 27/12/1999 AS AMENDED ON 28/04/2002 AS AMENDED ON 10/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 09/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 20/01/2013
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE HINDU RELIGION . (B) TO ESTABLISH SECURE OR BUILD A TEMPLE TO SRI MAHALAKSHMI AND SRI NARAYANAR (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS. (D) COMMUNITY SERVICE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.