Financial history DEVON COUNTY AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 292897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £2.28m £2.56m £1.05m £2.05m £2.28m
Total expenditure £2.34m £2.32m £1.23m £1.76m £2.01m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £91.59k £106.51k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £10.38k £2.37k £3.70k
Income - Other trading activities £962.95k £1.08m £780.97k £709.23k £886.43k
Income - Charitable activities £1.24m £1.39m £72.80k £1.14m £1.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £82.58k £86.22k £82.09k £91.01k £116.01k
Income - Other £0 £0 £108.43k £106.50k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.93m £1.87m £822.02k £1.48m £1.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £405.12k £450.92k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £22.72k £11.13k £15.46k £7.11k £6.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £405.32k £280.98k £316.62k