Trustees GREAT BRADLEY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 293044
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Housden | Chair | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian John Bhreathnach | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Barber | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Gale | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Housden | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Sugg | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annette Sugg | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Stroud | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.