Financial history HEARING DOGS FOR DEAF PEOPLE

Charity number: 293358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.73m £8.75m £9.43m £10.39m £12.28m
Total expenditure £7.74m £8.61m £9.86m £9.85m £9.49m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £23.00k £19.55k £21.70k £508.45k
Income - Donations and legacies £8.04m £8.14m £8.40m £9.20m £11.02m
Income - Other trading activities £514.83k £406.15k £873.19k £1.03m £546.01k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £15.06k £19.70k £21.68k £51.60k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £140.00k £148.24k £110.21k £89.04k £83.76k
Income - Other £39.67k £37.24k £31.67k £52.68k £579.11k
Income - Legacies £5.94m £5.55m £5.62m £5.68m £6.84m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.11m £6.93m £7.85m £7.55m £7.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.63m £1.68m £2.01m £2.31m £2.15m
Expenditure - Governance £71.55k £91.06k £84.55k £67.48k £73.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £47.04k £51.31k £50.67k £48.79k £48.20k
Expenditure - Other £0 £4.58k £0 £0 £0