Governing document THE WHITELANDS COLLEGE GUILD OF ST URSULA
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/10/1985 AS AMENDED ON 11/09/2004 AS AMENDED ON 18/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 15 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE: 1) TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF ANY WHITELANDER; 2) TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN EDUCATION; 3) TO PROMOTE THE RELIGIOUS AND EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF WHITELANDS COLLEGE. A "WHITELANDER" SHALL BE DEFINED AS ANY PRESENT OR PAST STUDENT OR MEMBER OF STAFF OF WHITELANDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.