Accounts and annual returns CODICOTE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 293715
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 September 2022 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 September 2022 85 days late
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 June 2021 On time
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time