1ST HANWELL (ST MARY'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 293898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £25.40k £24.70k £27.70k £30.17k £14.11k
Total expenditure £26.90k £22.76k £21.62k £28.39k £18.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k