Trustees SHROPSHIRE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 294260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rex Philip Sartain Chair 14 May 2019
RADBROOK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Susan Elizabeth Adams Taylor Trustee 12 February 2024
None on record
Major Charles Miller Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Samantha Brettell DL Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
John Villar Trustee 07 June 2023
SHROPSHIRE YEOMANRY COMRADES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
GUY PHILIP CHAMBERS Trustee 14 May 2019
THE OLD ELLESMERIAN CLUB CHARITY
Overdue by 1717 days
MUSEUM OF THE KING'S SHROPSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY
Received: On time
Major Charles Whitaker Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
Col Francis Acton Trustee 25 August 2014
None on record
MARK JOHN GUSTAVUS HAMILTON-RUSSELL Trustee 01 June 2014
THE GEOFFREY CHARLTON WOLRYCHE WHITMORE MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
COL MARIUS COULON Trustee 08 October 2012
None on record
MICHAEL EVANS Trustee
THE HARLEY CHARITY
Received: On time
SHROPSHIRE YEOMANRY COMRADES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE BERWICK ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time