KNOCKHOLT AMATEUR THEATRICAL SOCIETY (KATS)

Charity number: 294634
Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £8.38k £4.99k £6.52k £7.80k £1.79k
Total expenditure £6.58k £4.92k £4.30k £10.73k £2.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A