31ST GRAVESEND ST AIDANS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 294742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.69k £12.39k £7.46k £6.28k £16.45k
Total expenditure £4.81k £4.62k £5.78k £5.68k £7.15k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A