Financial history THE CHARITY OF SIR WILLIAM JOSEPH JORDAN

Charity number: 295014
Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.43k £1.48k £1.53k £1.56k £1.60k
Total expenditure £1.90k £2.26k £900 £2.50k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A