ST EDMUND'S SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 295114
Charity reporting is overdue by 1817 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £57.29k £7.38k £9.73k £18.21k £6.38k
Total expenditure £62.25k £0 £5.05k £6.04k £25.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A