Trustees DRUGLINK LIMITED
Charity number: 295384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID SWARBRICK | Chair | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Laventure | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Cutts | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Sharp | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Pedrithes | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Busse-Reid | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Conolly | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ray Knowles | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Cohen | Trustee | 11 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Padraig Dowd | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.