THE BLACKTHORNS PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 296156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £16.74k £21.89k £20.71k £19.62k £9.36k
Total expenditure £18.77k £14.58k £15.47k £24.57k £2.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A