THE NORTHREPPS BELL MAINTENANCE FUND

Charity number: 296256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £211 £285 £192 £102 £104
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £1.62k £297
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A