Financial history YEOVIL ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 296508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.01k £1.09k £1.40k £1.23k £382
Total expenditure £1.38k £743 £753 £1.47k £511
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A