Financial history THE SIDINGS COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 297095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £433.80k £393.28k £417.40k £398.97k £442.58k
Total expenditure £395.84k £425.36k £445.97k £409.08k £369.98k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £270.22k £174.59k £150.39k £146.11k £126.03k