ASLACTON AND GREAT MOULTON CORONATION HALL

Charity number: 297170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £20.23k £9.79k £21.73k £5.43k £12.65k
Total expenditure £18.59k £8.29k £20.95k £4.51k £4.83k
Income from government contracts £975 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k N/A N/A N/A £10.50k