Trustees Abortion Talk
Charity number: 297667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Jane Russell | Chair | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Yosef | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Zoe Georgina Macalpine | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Fisher | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Louise Gimson | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chowa Mwenya Nkonde | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hayley Webb | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Wendy Savage | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.