Trustees BOWERHILL VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 297945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Harris Chair 06 July 2015
None on record
Vicki Dorey Trustee 16 January 2024
None on record
Jemma Humphreys Trustee 14 November 2023
None on record
Lynne Smith Trustee 02 October 2023
None on record
Chris Light Trustee 10 January 2023
None on record
Andy Russell Trustee 17 August 2021
None on record
Ann Finch Trustee 17 August 2021
None on record
Rosemary Bellinger Trustee 18 December 2014
None on record
Marilyn Mills Trustee
None on record
CHRISTINE BROOM Trustee
WILTSHIRE WEST DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time