Trustees THE HENRY DOUBLEDAY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 298104
Charity reporting is up to date (35 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Hope | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sara Dawson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gordon Mitchell | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joylon Thorpe McIndoe | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Louise Taylor | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Wright | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Robinson | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Arrowsmith | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Amanda Jane Sandford | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adam Alexander | Trustee | 13 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.