Trustees DRIVING MOBILITY
Charity number: 298178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kimberley King | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Grose | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Blythe | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dean Alcock | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Roberts | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Parker | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sian Mitchell | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Perry | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Paul Graham | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Swain | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sean Lawrence | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALAN NORTON | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|||||
ANN FRYE | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.