Accounts and annual returns KENNINGTON PARK COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 298398
Charity reporting is overdue by 1597 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 136 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 136 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 501 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 501 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 866 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 866 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1231 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1231 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1597 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1597 days