THE SHIMPLING TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 298947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £266 £12.15k £8.36k £8.47k £11.67k
Total expenditure £17.65k £11.80k £15.32k £15.31k £13.62k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A