Trustees CORSHAM LINK
Charity number: 299183
Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Clapp | Chair | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
HILARY LIGHT | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hitchin | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Babs Light | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Stott | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Conrad | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Taylor | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Bament | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Dennis Harry Burge | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jean Taylor | Trustee | 29 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Michael Douglas Haswell | Trustee | 29 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.