HENFIELD AND DISTRICT SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 299283
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £213.75k £208.17k £231.58k £229.91k £274.38k
Total expenditure £213.72k £208.00k £224.15k £229.22k £243.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £50.00k