Financial history WESTMINSTER BOATING BASE

Charity number: 299412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £454.80k £378.03k £382.80k £379.43k £244.67k
Total expenditure £435.58k £460.00k £447.08k £198.70k £318.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.87k N/A £9.99k N/A £12.91k