Trustees SPITALFIELDS FARM ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Charity number: 299536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Stuart Rodel | Chair | 13 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catalina Mastac | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Mallett | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Momotaz Begum | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Andrew Thomas Morgan | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Michael Woods | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Michael Davidson | Trustee | 13 August 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.