BRITISH SOCIETY FOR EIGHTEENTH-CENTURY STUDIES

Charity number: 299756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 30 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 21 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 21 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 23 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 04 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 04 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 06 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 06 April 2017 On time Download