Trustees OAKLEY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 300054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL WHITE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephanie Blackwell | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Taylor | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Foskett | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Daniel | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ruth Bender | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|||||
David Cooke | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOAN THOMAS | Trustee | 18 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIA MARY NICHOLAS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.