Trustees VILLAGE HALL - CUMNOR
Charity number: 300146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Newton | Chair | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Donna Connelly Warne | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Alison Elizabeth Jenner | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr A H HARKER | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dona Foster | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Stevens | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Charlesworth | Trustee | 06 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr HARRY ANDREW DICKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.