Financial history CHALFONT ST PETER YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 300240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £46.47k £45.89k £36.52k £33.89k £38.89k
Total expenditure £27.89k £50.11k £36.45k £44.31k £18.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.80k £3.80k £3.40k £5.15k £21.10k