Trustees MARLOW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 300301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
39 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Scott | Chair | 15 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Joan Gunn | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Day | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Sunshine | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Edwards | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Howard | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Arnold | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Cassells | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Hopewell | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Robert Savidge | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hoyle | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Frost | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PART | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Jan Duckett | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ricketts | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mogg | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Smith | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hobson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Di Lavers | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Coster | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Espen Ostbye-Strom | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Wolton | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Lavers | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Michael Cannon | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Brown | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Newell | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Rae | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Sherwood | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Val Pounds | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
George Lawrence | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Susan Mahoney | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jones | Trustee | 27 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Maidment | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
HILARY MARTIN | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Reid | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Cox | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROGER WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE FLETT | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANN LEONARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.