Trustees SPEEN PLAYING FIELDS
Charity number: 300331
Charity reporting is up to date (108 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW WILLIAM WHITNEY DAVIES | Chair | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Christopher Butler | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Gater | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas William Ridley | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Johnston | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Patroe | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Allan | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
CRISTINA DELGADO | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN LEIGH FARLEY | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|||||
DUNCAN WILSON | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR GREG COOK | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER SYMONDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDY THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TONY BOBROFF | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.