CROXTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £450 £788 £3.58k £2.85k £1.60k
Total expenditure £873 £784 £828 £2.18k £796
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A