Trustees FALKES (LUTON) DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 300470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerald Law | Chair | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Helen Baker | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Haslam | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Brian Stuart Baker | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Norma Irene Farish | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Jean Elizabeth Clews | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zack Joseph Boutwood | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Missenden | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Llewellyn John Rees | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Waller | Trustee | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR SHARP | Trustee | 26 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DENISE O'HARA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADRIAN KEDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.