Trustees 1ST COOKHAM SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 300491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Simon Hague | Chair | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Danks-Burrows | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Thornton | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susie Felix | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY Sharples | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Michael Paul Roberson Day | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Delahaye | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Hellmuth | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin Jones | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Strudwicke | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Hurst | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kate Dilley | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|||||
NICK POWELL | Trustee | 16 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA DAVISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDY PEARCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW SUTHERLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALLY ANN CRICHTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.