Accounts and annual returns THE CORNWALL COUNTY PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 300648
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 April 2022 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required