Trustees 1ST HOLTSPUR SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 300656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cathryn Anderson | Chair | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Friend | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Strachan | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kothgari | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Peter Thom | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Leary | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Jane Oxnam | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Marie Hutchins | Trustee | 13 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLARE WARNETT | Trustee | 13 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Hellen Jayne Beveridge | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN RUTH POYSER | Trustee | 21 July 2013 |
|
|||||
RICHARD BATESON LISTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
PHILIP STEVEN GLASS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.