Financial history 1ST BOURNE END SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 300703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £39.99k £46.85k £39.31k £18.64k £35.28k
Total expenditure £38.57k £37.20k £35.98k £16.98k £27.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £8.00k