Trustees DOLTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 300816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE JURY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Valerie Milton | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Pollard | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
THERESA McCULLOCH | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD OATEN | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN PHILLIPS | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CELIA HOWITT | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEAN LEVETT | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA CHIVERS | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANICE EDITH HAYNES | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
WENDY HOLLAND | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROSE LOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.