Trustees HARTLAND RECREATION GROUND
Charity number: 300849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN REDWOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew Jinks | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Henry Clark | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lake | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gabriella Pyne | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ben Curnow | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Rowe | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Smith | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SHEPPARD | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOY COOPER | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Keith Andrew Petley | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS WALTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Bryan Olde | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA MARIAN BOYLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN RALPH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACK JEFFERY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH-JANE THRELKELD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.